UT HB0458 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Contracts Labor Amendments
Title
Public Contracts Labor Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Owens [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-27 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Business and Labor Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-02 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-01 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2024/bills/static/HB0458.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2024/bills/hbillint/HB0458.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2024/HB0458.fn.pdf |