UT HB0414S01 | 2014 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation HB0414

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Governor Vetoed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Legislative Subpoena Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative Subpoena Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-12 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-02 Governor Vetoed in LTGOV
2014-03-19 House/ to Governor in EGOV
2014-03-19HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
2014-03-19HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK
2014-03-13 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2014-03-13 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-13 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2014-03-13HouseSenate/ to House in HSPKR
2014-03-13HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ received from House in SPRES
2014-03-12SenateHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SPRES
2014-03-12SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2014-03-12SenateHouse/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES
2014-03-12HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL
2014-03-12HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2014-03-12HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK
2014-03-12HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ floor amendment in S3RD
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2014-03-12SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S3RD
2014-03-12SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S3RD
2014-03-11SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2014-03-11SenateSenate/ substituted in S2ND
2014-03-11SenateSenate/ uncircled in S2ND
2014-03-11SenateLFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in S2ND
2014-03-11SenateSenate/ circled in S2ND
2014-03-11SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2014-03-11SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2014-03-10SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL
2014-03-07SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2014-03-07SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in SSTGOP
2014-03-07SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP
2014-03-05SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP
2014-03-05SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2014-03-05SenateSenate/ received from House in SINTRO
2014-03-05SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2014-03-05SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2014-03-05HouseHouse/ uncircled in HCON
2014-03-05HouseHouse/ circled in HCON
2014-03-05HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in HCON
2014-03-03HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in HCON
2014-03-03HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTPOL
2014-03-03HouseHouse Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTPOL
2014-03-03HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTPOL
2014-02-28HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTPOL
2014-02-28HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL
2014-02-26HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2014-02-26HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2014-02-26 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC
2014-02-26 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Same As/Similar To

HB0414 (Replaces) 2014-03-11 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0414S01.htm
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/hbillint/hb0414s01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/hbillamd/hb0414s01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/hbillenr/hb0414.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2014GS&voteid=3564&sequence=24568
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=616&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=620&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=621&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2014GS&voteid=3817&sequence=24580
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1328&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1349&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1350&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1351&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1416&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1417&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1037&house=H&sessionid=2014GS

Bill Comments

feedback