UT HB0387 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Suspended Driver License Appeals Amendments
Title
Suspended Driver License Appeals Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-08 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Public Safety
Driver License
Driving Under the Influence (DUI)
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Motor Vehicles
Peace Officers
Public Safety
Roads/Highways
Traffic Violations
Transportation
Driver License
Driving Under the Influence (DUI)
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Motor Vehicles
Peace Officers
Public Safety
Roads/Highways
Traffic Violations
Transportation
Code Citations
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/static/HB0387.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0387.pdf |