UT HB0354 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Driver Education Funding Amendments
Title
Driver Education Funding Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House/ failed (Y: 37 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House/ failed (Y: 37 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-10 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-02-29 | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2016-02-29 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-29 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-29 | House | House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-29 | House/ motion to reconsider in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-29 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2016-02-29 | House/ failed in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-29 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2016-02-25 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2016-02-25 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in House Education Committee |
2016-02-25 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2016-02-25 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2016-02-25 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2016-02-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-16 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |