UT HB0341 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Athlete Agents Act
Title
Uniform Athlete Agents Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-16 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-05 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-05 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-05 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES | |
2010-03-02 | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-23 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-23 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2010-02-22 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-02-17 | House/ 2nd reading in HCON | |
2010-02-16 | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-12 | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-11 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-11 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-09 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-09 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |