UT HB0294 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Election Code Amendments
Title
Election Code Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-18 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Election Administration
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Voting and Voter Registration
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Voting and Voter Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20A | 1 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 1 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 1 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 1 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 1 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 1 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 1 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 1 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 1 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 1 | 508 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 1 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 2 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 21 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 4 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 5 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 5 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 6 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 6 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 6 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 6 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 8 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 8 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 9 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 9 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 9 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 9 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 9 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 9 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 9 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 9 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 9 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 9 | 409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 9 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 9 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 9 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63G | 2 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2024/bills/static/HB0294.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2024/bills/hbillint/HB0294.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2024/HB0294.fn.pdf |