UT HB0272 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-26 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTBUS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-26 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTBUS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Construction Trades Licensing Act Amendments
Title
Construction Trades Licensing Act Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Brian King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-26 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-09 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-05 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-04 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-02 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0272.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hb0272.pdf |