UT HB0250 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Banner Task Force
Title
State Banner Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-10 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |