UT HB0243 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Riparian Amendments
Title
Riparian Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - House - House/ failed (Y: 35 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ substituted from # 3 to # 4 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-22 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | House Comm - Held in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2024-01-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-10 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |