UT HB0185 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Initiative and Referendum Amendments
Title
Initiative and Referendum Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Counties
Election Administration
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Initiatives
Metro Townships
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Referenda
Voting and Voter Registration
Election Administration
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Initiatives
Metro Townships
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Referenda
Voting and Voter Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20A | 7 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 7 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |