UT HB0152 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ballot Information Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ballot Information Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 2 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 46 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House/ failed (Y: 36 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2021-02-26HouseHouse/ filed in Clerk of the House
2021-02-26HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-02-25HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ failed in Senate Secretary
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-22SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-22SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-22SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-17SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-08SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-08SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-02-05SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-02-05SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-02-05HouseHouse/ motion to reconsider in Clerk of the House
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ failed in Clerk of the House
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-29HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-29HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Government Operations Committee
2021-01-28HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee
2021-01-28HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Government Operations Committee
2021-01-28HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Government Operations Committee
2021-01-25HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2021-01-13HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2021-01-12 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-12 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17B1306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A12201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A6203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A6301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A6302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A6305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A6401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A6402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A9403Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/HB0152.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0152.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0152S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0152.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0152.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0152S01_ComparedWith_HB0152.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0152S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0152S01.pna.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=18738
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=18739
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=237&house=H
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=259&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20015
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=998&house=S

Bill Comments 750

feedback