UT HB0130 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Animal Fighting Penalties
Title
Animal Fighting Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-21 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-16 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-16 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-03 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-03 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |