UT HB0108 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcohol Licensee Video Recording Requirements
Title
Alcohol Licensee Video Recording Requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Rohner [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-24 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-23 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-01-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-02 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-02 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-02 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-02 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Alcohol
Business
Crimes
Driving Under the Influence (DUI)
Food Services and Drinking Places
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Business
Crimes
Driving Under the Influence (DUI)
Food Services and Drinking Places
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32B | 5 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32B | 6 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32B | 6 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |