UT HB0093 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

County Formation Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Formation Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - House/ failed (Y: 29 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2019-03-14HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2019-03-11HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House file for bills not passed
2019-03-11HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House file for bills not passed
2019-03-08HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2019-03-08HouseHouse/ failed in Clerk of the House
2019-03-08HouseHouse/ substituted from # 0 to # 5 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-03-07HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-03-06HouseHouse/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee
2019-02-12HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-12HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-04HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-04HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Government Operations Committee
2019-02-01HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee
2019-01-29HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee
2019-01-28HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2019-01-28HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2019-01-22HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2019-01-09 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-01-09 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback