UT HB0086 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Safety Data Amendments
Title
Public Safety Data Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2024-03-01 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-29 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-28 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-28 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-28 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2024-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-28 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 3nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-05 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-05 | House | House/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-05 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-01 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-25 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-25 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-12-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-12-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Alcohol
Bureau of Criminal Identification
Business
Commission on Criminal and Juvenile Justice
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Department of Government Operations
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Public Safety
Division of Child and Family Services
Division of Technology Services
Economic Development
Education
Government Operations (State Issues)
Government Records
Grant Programs and Incentives
Health and Human Services
Housing
Inmates
Judicial Operations
K-12 Education
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Local Mental Health Authorities
Local Substance Abuse Authorities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Safety
Public Utilities and Technology
Sexual Offenses
State Board of Education
Technology
Weapons
Workforce Services
Bureau of Criminal Identification
Business
Commission on Criminal and Juvenile Justice
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Department of Government Operations
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Public Safety
Division of Child and Family Services
Division of Technology Services
Economic Development
Education
Government Operations (State Issues)
Government Records
Grant Programs and Incentives
Health and Human Services
Housing
Inmates
Judicial Operations
K-12 Education
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Local Mental Health Authorities
Local Substance Abuse Authorities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Safety
Public Utilities and Technology
Sexual Offenses
State Board of Education
Technology
Weapons
Workforce Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26B | 1 | 427 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53E | 3 | 516 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63A | 16 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63A | 16 | 1002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63M | 7 | 214 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63M | 7 | 216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63M | 7 | 218 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |