US SR561 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-28 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4743)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-28 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4743)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating July 15, 2018, as "National Leiomyosarcoma Awareness Day" and the month of July 2018 as "National Sarcoma Awareness Month". Designates July 15, 2018, as National Leiomyosarcoma Awareness Day and July 2018 as National Sarcoma Awareness Month. (Sarcoma is a malignant cancer that arises from certain tissues, such as bone or muscle. Leiomyosarcoma is a type of sarcoma that arises from smooth muscle tissue, most commonly originating in the uterus, stomach, intestine, or blood vessels.) Recognizes the challenges faced by sarcoma and leiomyosarcoma patients and commends the dedication of organizations, volunteers, researchers, and caregivers working to improve the quality of life of sarcoma and leiomyosarcoma patients and their families.
Title
A resolution designating July 15, 2018, as "National Leiomyosarcoma Awareness Day" and the month of July 2018 as "National Sarcoma Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4743) |
Same As/Similar To
HR420 (Related) 2017-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR973 (Related) 2018-06-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR207 (Related) 2017-06-28 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3834)
HR1103 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR973 (Related) 2018-06-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR207 (Related) 2017-06-28 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3834)
HR1103 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Subjects
Cancer
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Health
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Health
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/561/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres561/BILLS-115sres561is.pdf |