US HR420 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the week of July 9 through July 15, 2017, as "Sarcoma Awareness Week" and July 15, 2017, as "Leiomyosarcoma Awareness Day". Expresses support for the designation of Sarcoma Awareness Week and Leiomyosarcoma Awareness Day. (Sarcoma is a malignant cancer that arises from certain tissues, such as bone or muscle. Leiomyosarcoma is a type of sarcoma that arises from smooth muscle tissue, most commonly originating in the uterus, stomach, intestine, or blood vessels.) Recognizes the challenges faced by sarcoma and leiomyosarcoma patients and commends the dedication of organizations, volunteers, researchers, and caregivers working to improve the quality of life of sarcoma and leiomyosarcoma patients and their families.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of July 9 through July 15, 2017, as "Sarcoma Awareness Week" and July 15, 2017, as "Leiomyosarcoma Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-06-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-06-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR207 (Related) 2017-06-28 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3834)
HR973 (Related) 2018-06-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR561 (Related) 2018-06-28 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4743)
HR973 (Related) 2018-06-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR561 (Related) 2018-06-28 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4743)
Subjects
Cancer
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Health
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Health
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/420/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres420/BILLS-115hres420ih.pdf |