US SR199 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1-1)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2369; text: CR S2369)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2369; text: CR S2369)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution condemning the horrific shootings in Atlanta, Georgia, on March 16, 2021, and reaffirming the commitment of the Senate to combating hate, bigotry, and violence against the Asian American and Pacific Islander community.
Title
A resolution condemning the horrific shootings in Atlanta, Georgia, on March 16, 2021, and reaffirming the commitment of the Senate to combating hate, bigotry, and violence against the Asian American and Pacific Islander community.
Sponsors
Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2369; text: CR S2369) |
Same As/Similar To
HR275 (Related) 2021-05-19 - CHAIR ANNOUNCEMENT - The Chair announced a correction to Roll Call number 149 the yeas were 245 and the nays were 180.
SR140 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1834)
HR403 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR140 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1834)
HR403 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/199/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres199/BILLS-117sres199ats.pdf |