US SR140 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1834)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1834)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution condemning the horrific shootings in Atlanta, Georgia, on March 16, 2021, and reaffirming the commitment of the Senate to combating hate, bigotry, and violence against the Asian-American and Pacific Islander community.
Title
A resolution condemning the horrific shootings in Atlanta, Georgia, on March 16, 2021, and reaffirming the commitment of the Senate to combating hate, bigotry, and violence against the Asian-American and Pacific Islander community.
Sponsors
Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1834) |
Same As/Similar To
HR275 (Related) 2021-05-19 - CHAIR ANNOUNCEMENT - The Chair announced a correction to Roll Call number 149 the yeas were 245 and the nays were 180.
SR199 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2369; text: CR S2369)
HR403 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR199 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2369; text: CR S2369)
HR403 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/140/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres140/BILLS-117sres140is.pdf |