US HR275 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 149-1)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - CHAIR ANNOUNCEMENT - The Chair announced a correction to Roll Call number 149 the yeas were 245 and the nays were 180.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This resolution condemns the acts of gun violence that led to the tragic loss of eight lives in Georgia on March 16, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condemning the horrific shootings in Atlanta, Georgia, on March 16, 2021, and reaffirming the House of Representative's commitment to combating hate, bigotry, and violence against the Asian-American and Pacific Islander community.

Sponsors

Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Carolyn Bourdeaux [D-GA]Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]
Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]
Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]
Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]
Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]
Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]
Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]

Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 245 N: 180 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19HouseCHAIR ANNOUNCEMENT - The Chair announced a correction to Roll Call number 149 the yeas were 245 and the nays were 180.
2021-05-19HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-05-19HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 245 - 180 (Roll no. 149). (text: 05/18/2021 CR H2520)
2021-05-19HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2571-2572)
2021-05-18HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 275, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Fallon demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
2021-05-18HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2021-05-18HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 275.
2021-05-18HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 1629 and H. Res. 275. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1629 under a closed rule and H. Res. 275 under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on both the bill and resolution. The rule provides that H. Res. 398 is hereby adopted. The rule provides at any time through the legislative day of Thursday, May 20, 2021, the Speaker may entertain motions offered by the Majority Leader or designee with respect to multiple measures that were object of motions to suspend the rules on the legislative days of May 17 or 18, 2021.
2021-05-18HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 403. (consideration: CR H2520-2525)
2021-05-18HouseRule H. Res. 403 passed House.
2021-05-17HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 403 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1629 and H. Res. 275. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1629 under a closed rule and H. Res. 275 under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on both the bill and resolution. The rule provides that H. Res. 398 is hereby adopted. The rule provides at any time through the legislative day of Thursday, May 20, 2021, the Speaker may entertain motions offered by the Majority Leader or designee with respect to multiple measures that were object of motions to suspend the rules on the legislative days of May 17 or 18, 2021.
2021-03-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2021-03-26HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR140 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1834)
SR199 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2369; text: CR S2369)
HR403 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback