US SR189 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8729)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8729)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate regarding the 25th anniversary of democracy in Mongolia. Congratulates the people and the government of Mongolia on the 25th anniversary of the first democratic elections in Mongolia, to be celebrated on July 29, 2015. Commends Mongolia for a peaceful and successful democratic transition. Recognizes Mongolia's role as a global leader for emerging democracies. Acknowledges the shared interest of the U.S. government and the government of Mongolia in promoting peace and stability in Northeast and Central Asia. Recognizes that the United States should continue to support actions taken by the government of Mongolia to develop democratic institutions. Recommends that the U.S. government expand academic, cultural, and other people-to-people partnerships between Mongolia and the United States.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate regarding the 25th anniversary of democracy in Mongolia.
Sponsors
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-16 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8729) |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 320. |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3407-3408) |
Same As/Similar To
HR339 (Related) 2016-01-12 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Subjects
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Cultural exchanges and relations
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
Mongolia
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Cultural exchanges and relations
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
Mongolia
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status