US HR339 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-12 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-12 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding the 25th anniversary of democracy in Mongolia. Congratulates the people and the government of Mongolia on the 25th anniversary of the first democratic elections in Mongolia. Recognizes Mongolia's role as a global leader for emerging democracies. Acknowledges the shared interest of the U.S. government and the government of Mongolia in promoting peace and stability in Northeast and Central Asia. Recommends that the U.S. government expand academic, cultural, and other people-to-people partnerships between Mongolia and the United States.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding the 25th anniversary of democracy in Mongolia.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2016-01-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-08-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific. |
2015-06-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2015-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR189 (Related) 2015-12-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8729)
Subjects
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Cultural exchanges and relations
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
Mongolia
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Cultural exchanges and relations
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
Mongolia
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-resolution/339/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hres339/BILLS-114hres339ih.pdf |