US SB987 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to provide support with respect to the prevention of, treatment for, and recovery from, substance use disorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CARA 3.0 Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Same As/Similar To

SB586 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB889 (Related) 2021-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1647 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB340 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2344 (Related) 2021-04-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.

Subjects

Advisory bodies
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Health and Human Services
Detention of persons
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Economic development
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Home and outpatient care
Hospital care
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medical education
Medical ethics
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Mental health
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Prescription drugs
Public housing
Rural conditions and development
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Specialized courts
State and local government operations
Surgery and anesthesia
Telephone and wireless communication
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care
Women's health
Worker safety and health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback