US HB1647 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies requirements relating to coverage of certain telehealth services under Medicare. Specifically, the bill permanently allows telehealth services for substance-use disorders and mental health disorders to be provided via audio-only technology, if a physician or practitioner has already conducted an in-person or video telehealth evaluation. Schedule III or IV controlled substances may also be prescribed online if a practitioner has conducted a telehealth evaluation with video.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TREATS Act Telehealth Response for E-prescribing Addiction Therapy Services Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-03-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB340 (Same As) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB987 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback