US SB340 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to increase the use of telehealth for substance use disorder treatment and mental health services, and for other purposes.
Title
TREATS Act Telehealth Response for E-prescribing Addiction Therapy Services Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1647 (Same As) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB987 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4341 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB987 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4341 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/340/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s340/BILLS-117s340is.pdf |