US SB893 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to support the use of technology in maternal health care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tech to Save Moms Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Same As/Similar To

HB937 (Related) 2021-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB959 (Related) 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB346 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects

Advanced technology and technological innovations
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Digital media
Disability and health-based discrimination
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Educational technology and distance education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Food assistance and relief
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Medicaid
Medical education
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Minority health
Poverty and welfare assistance
Racial and ethnic relations
Right of privacy
Technology assessment
Women's health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback