US HB937 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XI of the Social Security Act to integrate telehealth models in maternity care services, and for other purposes.
Title
Tech To Save Moms Act
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] |
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB959 (Related) 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB346 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB893 (Related) 2021-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8862 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB346 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB893 (Related) 2021-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8862 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/937/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr937/BILLS-117hr937ih.pdf |