US SB872 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Hospital Access Act of 2017 This bill permanently extends the Medicare-Dependent Hospital program (which provides increased payments to certain smaller, rural hospitals that serve a proportionally high number of Medicare patients) and the program for increased payments under Medicare for low-volume hospitals.
Title
Rural Hospital Access Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1955 (Same As) 2017-04-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4178 (Related) 2017-11-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8304)
HB4820 (Related) 2018-01-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4178 (Related) 2017-11-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8304)
HB4820 (Related) 2018-01-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Hospital care
Medicare
Rural conditions and development
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Hospital care
Medicare
Rural conditions and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/872/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s872/BILLS-115s872is.pdf |