US HB4178 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on October 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8304)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8304)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEART Act Healthcare Enhancement for Americas Rural Towns Act This bill permanently extends and otherwise revises the Medicare-Dependent Hospital program (which provides increased payments to certain smaller, rural hospitals that serve a proportionally high number of Medicare patients). The bill also extends through FY 2019 the program for increased payments under Medicare for low-volume hospitals.
Title
HEART Act Healthcare Enhancement for Americas Rural Towns Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] |
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-01 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8304) |
2017-10-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-10-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1955 (Related) 2017-04-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB872 (Related) 2017-04-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB872 (Related) 2017-04-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Hospital care
Medicare
Rural conditions and development
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Hospital care
Medicare
Rural conditions and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4178/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4178/BILLS-115hr4178ih.pdf |