US HB4820 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 85-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ASK Act Advancing Seniors and Kids Act This bill extends, and otherwise revises, various public health and social welfare programs. Specifically, the bill: permanently extends the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP); extends by one year, but reduces by half, additional federal financial participation for CHIP; extends CHIP's qualifying-states option, express-lane eligibility option, and outreach and enrollment program; extends the Child Enrollment Contingency Fund, the Childhood Obesity Demonstration Project, and the Pediatric Quality Measures Program; modifies Medicare payment rules and reporting requirements with respect to ground-ambulance services; permanently extends specialized Medicare Advantage (MA) plans for certain special-needs individuals; expands certain supplemental benefits under MA for chronically ill enrollees; extends the Medicare payment adjustment known as the "home-health rural add-on"; makes permanent or extends other specified programs and payment rules under Medicare; under Medicaid, extends certain health workforce demonstration projects as well as specified programs related to community health centers, diabetes, graduate medical education, family-to-family health-information centers, abstinence education, and personal-responsibility education; delays certain changes, under Medicaid, to disproportionate-share hospital allotments and to third-party liability provisions; extends the Maternal, Infant, and Early Childhood Home Visiting Program and requires, under the program, continued demonstration of improvements in certain benchmark areas; establishes a grant program for the monitoring of representative payees under the Supplemental Security Income (SSI) program and the Old Age, Survivors, and Disability Insurance (OASDI) program; otherwise revises provisions related to representative payment under SSI and OASDI; and with respect to the child-welfare system, modifies provisions related to information sharing and to overpayment liability.
Title
ASK Act Advancing Seniors and Kids Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1955 (Related) 2017-04-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2959 (Related) 2017-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3044 (Related) 2017-07-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3168 (Related) 2017-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 353.
HB3729 (Related) 2017-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 356.
HB3926 (Related) 2017-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4547 (Related) 2018-04-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-165.
SB872 (Related) 2017-04-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1829 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2597 (Related) 2018-12-10 - Held at the desk.
HB2959 (Related) 2017-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3044 (Related) 2017-07-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3168 (Related) 2017-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 353.
HB3729 (Related) 2017-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 356.
HB3926 (Related) 2017-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4547 (Related) 2018-04-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-165.
SB872 (Related) 2017-04-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1829 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2597 (Related) 2018-12-10 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4820/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4820/BILLS-115hr4820ih.pdf |