US HB3729 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 356.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Comprehensive Operations, Sustainability, and Transport Act of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive Operations, Sustainability, and Transport Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-21HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 356.
2017-12-21HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
2017-12-21HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-481, Part I.
2017-09-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-09-13HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2017-09-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-09-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-09-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-09-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4820 (Related) 2018-01-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1892 (Related) 2018-02-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-123.
HB3236 (Related) 2017-07-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback