US SB855 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pay Our Troops Act - Requires the Secretary of the Treasury, during a federal funding gap impacting the Armed Forces, to transfer to the Secretary of Defense (DOD), and the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) in the case of the Coast Guard, amounts necessary to continue to provide pay and allowances to members of the Armed Forces, including the reserves, who perform active service during the funding gap.
Title
Pay Our Troops Act
Sponsors
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Kay Hutchison [R-TX] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
Sen. Jeff Sessions [R-AL] | Sen. Olympia Snowe [R-ME] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1297 (Related) 2011-07-14 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Gohmert. Petition No: 112-2. ( ">Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HB1442 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1469 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1551 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Referred to House Appropriations
SB721 (Related) 2011-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
SB724 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2291, S2291-2292, S2322-2323)
HB2496 (Related) 2011-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB1442 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1469 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1551 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Referred to House Appropriations
SB721 (Related) 2011-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
SB724 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2291, S2291-2292, S2322-2323)
HB2496 (Related) 2011-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Coast guard
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Wages and earnings
Armed forces and national security
Coast guard
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/855/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s855/BILLS-112s855is.pdf |