US HB2496 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Payment Reliability for our Obligations to Military and Investors to Secure Essential Stability Act or the PROMISES Act - Sets forth the priority of the payment of obligations incurred by the U.S. government in the event that U.S. debt reaches the statutory limit. Directs the Secretary of the Treasury, during any funding gap impacting the Armed Forces, to make emergency appropriations to continue to provide pay and allowances (without interruption) to members of the Army, Navy, Air Force, Marine Corps, and Coast Guard, including the reserve components thereof, who perform active service.
Title
Payment Reliability for our Obligations to Military and Investors to Secure Essential Stability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Michele Bachmann [R-MN] | Rep. Roscoe Bartlett [R-MD] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] |
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Wally Herger [R-CA] | Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2011-07-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2011-07-12 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2011-07-12 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2011-07-12 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-07-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1297 (Related) 2011-07-14 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Gohmert. Petition No: 112-2. ( ">Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HB1908 (Related) 2011-05-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB855 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1365 (Related) 2011-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB2402 (Related) 2011-06-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB721 (Related) 2011-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB1908 (Related) 2011-05-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB855 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1365 (Related) 2011-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB2402 (Related) 2011-06-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB721 (Related) 2011-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Budget deficits and national debt
Coast guard
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Armed forces and national security
Budget deficits and national debt
Coast guard
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2496/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2496/BILLS-112hr2496ih.pdf |