US HB1297 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 161-49)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-14 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Gohmert. Petition No: 112-2. ( ">Discharge petition text with signatures.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-14 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Gohmert. Petition No: 112-2. ( ">Discharge petition text with signatures.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring Pay for Our Military Act of 2011 - Requires the Secretary of the Treasury, during a federal funding gap impacting the Armed Forces, to transfer to the Secretary of Defense (DOD), and the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) in the case of the Coast Guard, amounts necessary to continue to provide pay and allowances to members of the Armed Forces, including the reserves, who perform active service during the funding gap. Prohibits any such transfer after December 31, 2011.
Title
Ensuring Pay for Our Military Act of 2011
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-14 | House | Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Gohmert. Petition No: 112-2. ( ">Discharge petition text with signatures.) |
2011-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2011-04-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2011-03-31 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2011-03-31 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2011-03-31 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1362 (Related) 2011-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
HB1442 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1469 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1494 (Related) 2011-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1508 (Related) 2011-04-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1551 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Referred to House Appropriations
SB721 (Same As) 2011-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
SB724 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2291, S2291-2292, S2322-2323)
SB855 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB2496 (Related) 2011-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB1442 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1469 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1494 (Related) 2011-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1508 (Related) 2011-04-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1551 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Referred to House Appropriations
SB721 (Same As) 2011-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
SB724 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2291, S2291-2292, S2322-2323)
SB855 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB2496 (Related) 2011-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Coast guard
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Military personnel and dependents
Wages and earnings
Armed forces and national security
Coast guard
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Military personnel and dependents
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1297/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1297/BILLS-112hr1297ih.pdf |