US HB1469 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 82-11-1)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honor Our Fallen Heroes Act - Appropriates amounts to the Secretary of Defense (DOD) and the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) during a funding gap impacting the Armed Forces to allow for the timely payment of death gratuities under specified code provisions addressing death benefits for deceased military personnel. Defines "funding gap" as any period during FY2011 for which interim or full-year appropriations (other than as provided by this Act) for the personnel accounts of the Armed Forces for that fiscal year have not been enacted.
Title
Honor Our Fallen Heroes Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1297 (Related) 2011-07-14 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Gohmert. Petition No: 112-2. ( ">Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HB1442 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1494 (Related) 2011-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1508 (Related) 2011-04-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1551 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Referred to House Appropriations
SB721 (Related) 2011-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
SB724 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2291, S2291-2292, S2322-2323)
SB855 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB1442 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1494 (Related) 2011-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1508 (Related) 2011-04-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1551 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Referred to House Appropriations
SB721 (Related) 2011-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
SB724 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2291, S2291-2292, S2322-2323)
SB855 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Coast guard
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Armed forces and national security
Coast guard
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1469/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1469/BILLS-112hr1469ih.pdf |