US SB724 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2291, S2291-2292, S2322-2323)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2291, S2291-2292, S2322-2323)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring Pay for Our Military Act of 2011 - Requires the Secretary of the Treasury, during a federal funding gap impacting the Armed Forces, to transfer to the Secretary of Defense (DHS), and the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) in the case of the Coast Guard, amounts necessary to continue to provide pay and allowances to members of the Armed Forces, including the reserves, who perform active service during the funding gap. Allows for the provision of such pay and allowances, at the discretion of the Secretary of Defense, for: (1) civilian DOD personnel providing support to such members; and (2) DOD contractor personnel providing direct support to such members. Prohibits any such transfer after December 31, 2011.
Title
Ensuring Pay for Our Military Act of 2011
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2291, S2291-2292, S2322-2323) |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2257-2258) |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2152-2153) |
2011-04-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1297 (Related) 2011-07-14 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Gohmert. Petition No: 112-2. ( ">Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HB1442 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1469 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1494 (Related) 2011-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1508 (Related) 2011-04-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1551 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Referred to House Appropriations
SB721 (Related) 2011-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
SB774 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2359-2360)
SB777 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB855 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB1442 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1469 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1494 (Related) 2011-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1508 (Related) 2011-04-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB1551 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Referred to House Appropriations
SB721 (Related) 2011-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
SB774 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2359-2360)
SB777 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB855 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Coast guard
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
National Guard and reserves
Public contracts and procurement
Wages and earnings
Armed forces and national security
Coast guard
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
National Guard and reserves
Public contracts and procurement
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/724/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s724/BILLS-112s724is.pdf |