NH HB1065 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Hearing: 05/01/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 17
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:15 am in Room 103, State House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Hearing: 05/01/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 17
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:15 am in Room 103, State House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to fire sprinkler requirements in residential buildings.
Title
Relative to fire sprinkler requirements in residential buildings.
Sponsors
Rep. Hope Damon [D] | Rep. Joe Alexander [R] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Mark McConkey [R] |
Rep. Josh Yokela [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Hearing: 05/01/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1046h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-1046h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1046h 03/08/2024 (Vote 10-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 18 |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-02-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/08/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 02/16/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Special Committee on Housing |