US SB442 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-202.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-202.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 40, United States Code, to require the Administrator of General Services to procure the most life-cycle cost effective and energy efficient lighting products and to issue guidance on the efficiency, effectiveness, and economy of those products, and for other purposes.
Title
BRIGHT Act Bulb Replacement Improving Government with High-efficiency Technology Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-14 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 347 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-17 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-202. |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-09-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 347 - 78 (Roll no. 430). (text: 9/13/2022 CR H7759-7760) |
2022-09-14 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7824-7825) |
2022-09-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 442. |
2022-09-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7759-7760) |
2022-09-13 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-03-31 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-03-31 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1860; text: CR S1860-1861) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 274. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 117-80. |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7636 (Same As) 2022-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 441.