US SB4160 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-148.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-148.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 40, United States Code, to grant the Supreme Court of the United States security-related authorities equivalent to the legislative and executive branches.
Title
Supreme Court Police Parity Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-14 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 396 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-148. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-06-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-06-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 396 - 27 (Roll no. 261). (text: CR H5495) |
2022-06-14 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5506-5507) |
2022-06-14 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-06-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 4160. |
2022-06-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5495-5499) |
2022-06-14 | House | Mr. Lieu moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-05-10 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-05-10 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2384) |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2384) |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7705 (Same As) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB7712 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
SB4146 (Related) 2022-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7712 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
SB4146 (Related) 2022-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.