US HB7712 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 40, United States Code, to grant the Supreme Court Police authority to protect the families of the justices, officers, and employees of the Supreme Court.
Title
Supreme Court Families Security Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2022-05-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-05-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7705 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
SB4146 (Related) 2022-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4160 (Related) 2022-06-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-148.
SB4146 (Related) 2022-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4160 (Related) 2022-06-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-148.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7712/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7712/BILLS-117hr7712ih.pdf |