US HB7705 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 40, United States Code, to grant the Supreme Court of the United States security-related authorities equivalent to the legislative and executive branches.
Title
Supreme Court Police Parity Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] |
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] | Rep. Julia Letlow [R-LA] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Lisa McClain [R-MI] | Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] |
Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Yvette Herrell [R-NM] |
Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR] | Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2022-05-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-05-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7712 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
SB4146 (Related) 2022-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4160 (Same As) 2022-06-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-148.
SB4146 (Related) 2022-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4160 (Same As) 2022-06-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-148.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7705/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7705/BILLS-117hr7705ih.pdf |