US SB3703 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

NFIP Extension Act of 2018 This bill amends the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 to reauthorize the National Flood Insurance Program through September 30, 2019. The bill shall take effect as if it had been enacted on December 7, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NFIP Extension Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB1423 (Related) 2017-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB2874 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3285 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
HB3723 (Related) 2017-09-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6379 (Related) 2018-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6402 (Related) 2018-07-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB7187 (Related) 2018-12-01 - Became Public Law No: 115-281.
SB1182 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-225. (TXT | PDF)
SB1313 (Related) 2017-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3337-3338)
SB1368 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1571 (Related) 2017-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3128 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3628 (Related) 2018-12-03 - Held at the desk.
SB3670 (Related) 2018-11-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback