US HB1423 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Flood Insurance Program Reauthorization and Improvement Act of 2017 This bill amends the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 to extend the National Flood Insurance Program (NFIP) through FY2027. Every policy issued under NFIP must include documents describing the type of loss covered, a summary of the costs of the policy, and an explanation of the policy's parameters. The Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) is directed to establish a program for "Write Your Own" companies (a company that writes and services federal standard flood insurance policies in its own name) to investigate preexisting structural conditions in properties. Participation in this program shall be voluntary. In the event a policyholder prevails in a lawsuit regarding claims against an insurance company or FEMA, the court may award litigation costs. Costs of an administrative appeal shall be awarded to a prevailing claimant. Engineers providing services in connection with NFIP must be certified by FEMA and be professionally licensed as an engineer. FEMA must establish a publicly searchable online registry of companies and individuals providing services related to NFIP. The bill establishes criminal and civil penalties for committing fraud or making false statements in connection with NFIP. The bill establishes whistleblower protections for individuals performing tasks related to NFIP, including federal employees, Write Your Own employees, and third-party administrators and service providers. It is unlawful for Write Your Own companies to violate the independence of a provider of engineering services in connection with flood insurance coverage. The Government Accountability Office must report on: (1) the effects of global warming on NFIP solvency, and (2) Hurricane Sandy claims handled by Write Your Own companies.
Title
National Flood Insurance Program Reauthorization and Improvement Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6922 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB3628 (Related) 2018-12-31 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 148, enrollment corrections on S. 3628 have been made.
HB7187 (Related) 2018-12-01 - Became Public Law No: 115-281.
SB3670 (Related) 2018-11-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3703 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3628 (Related) 2018-12-31 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 148, enrollment corrections on S. 3628 have been made.
HB7187 (Related) 2018-12-01 - Became Public Law No: 115-281.
SB3670 (Related) 2018-11-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3703 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Finance and financial sector
Floods and storm protection
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Insurance industry and regulation
Licensing and registrations
Natural disasters
User charges and fees
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Finance and financial sector
Floods and storm protection
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Insurance industry and regulation
Licensing and registrations
Natural disasters
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1423/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1423/BILLS-115hr1423ih.pdf |