US HB7187 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-01 - Became Public Law No: 115-281.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-01 - Became Public Law No: 115-281.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Flood Insurance Program Further Extension Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 to reauthorize the National Flood Insurance Program through December 7, 2018.
Title
National Flood Insurance Program Further Extension Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 424 (Y: 350 N: 46 NV: 36 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-01 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-281. |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-11-30 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7246) |
2018-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H9710) |
2018-11-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 350 - 46 (Roll no. 424). |
2018-11-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9703-9730) |
2018-11-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7187. |
2018-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9710-9714) |
2018-11-29 | House | Mr. Hensarling moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-11-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2018-11-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1423 (Related) 2017-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB3723 (Related) 2017-09-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6379 (Related) 2018-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6402 (Related) 2018-07-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1182 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-225. (TXT | PDF)
SB1313 (Related) 2017-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3337-3338)
SB1571 (Related) 2017-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3628 (Related) 2018-12-31 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 148, enrollment corrections on S. 3628 have been made.
SB3670 (Related) 2018-11-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3703 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB7388 (Related) 2018-12-21 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 148 - 226 (Roll no. 497). (text: CR H10560-10566)
HB3723 (Related) 2017-09-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6379 (Related) 2018-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6402 (Related) 2018-07-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1182 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-225. (TXT | PDF)
SB1313 (Related) 2017-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3337-3338)
SB1571 (Related) 2017-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3628 (Related) 2018-12-31 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 148, enrollment corrections on S. 3628 have been made.
SB3670 (Related) 2018-11-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3703 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB7388 (Related) 2018-12-21 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 148 - 226 (Roll no. 497). (text: CR H10560-10566)