US SB3628 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 148, enrollment corrections on S. 3628 have been made.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 148, enrollment corrections on S. 3628 have been made.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Flood Insurance Program Extension Act This bill amends the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 to reauthorize the National Flood Insurance Program through May 31, 2019. The bill shall take effect as if it had been enacted on December 7, 2018.
Title
National Flood Insurance Program Extension Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 500 (Y: 315 N: 48 NV: 69 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 148, enrollment corrections on S. 3628 have been made. |
2018-12-21 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-12-21 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-12-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 315 - 48 (Roll no. 500). (text: CR H10581-10582) |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10583-10584) |
2018-12-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3628. |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10581-10582) |
2018-12-21 | House | Mr. MacArthur moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-12-03 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-03 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-11-30 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S7246) |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7246) |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
HB1423 (Related) 2017-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB2874 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3285 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
HB3723 (Related) 2017-09-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6379 (Related) 2018-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6402 (Related) 2018-07-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1182 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-225. (TXT | PDF)
SB1313 (Related) 2017-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3337-3338)
SB1368 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1571 (Related) 2017-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3128 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB7187 (Related) 2018-12-01 - Became Public Law No: 115-281.
SB3670 (Related) 2018-11-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3703 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HCR148 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB7388 (Related) 2018-12-21 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 148 - 226 (Roll no. 497). (text: CR H10560-10566)
HB1423 (Related) 2017-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB2874 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3285 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
HB3723 (Related) 2017-09-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6379 (Related) 2018-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6402 (Related) 2018-07-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1182 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-225. (TXT | PDF)
SB1313 (Related) 2017-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3337-3338)
SB1368 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1571 (Related) 2017-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3128 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB7187 (Related) 2018-12-01 - Became Public Law No: 115-281.
SB3670 (Related) 2018-11-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3703 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HCR148 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB7388 (Related) 2018-12-21 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 148 - 226 (Roll no. 497). (text: CR H10560-10566)