US HB3285 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sustainable, Affordable, Fair, and Efficient (SAFE) National Flood Insurance Program Reauthorization Act of 2017 This bill amends the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 to extend through FY2023 the National Flood Insurance Program (NFIP). NFIP policy coverage limits for residential and nonresidential buildings are increased. NFIP premiums, surcharges, and fees may not be increased by more than 10% each year. The Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) must provide: (1) loans for mitigation projects, and (2) other financial assistance to qualified households for NFIP premium payments and mitigation projects. The limitation on Increased Cost of Compliance (ICC) coverage (offered by NFIP to cover the cost of flood mitigation measures on certain structures) is increased to $100,000 and ICC eligibility is expanded. This bill prevents the Department of the Treasury from charging interest to FEMA on amounts borrowed for NFIP through FY2023. This bill directs FEMA to revise: (1) directives related to the Write Your Own program, (2) specified elements of the claims process, (3) the appeals process for claims and flood map determinations, and (4) certain flood risk zones. FEMA must study business interruption coverage and participation rates in specified flood zones. This bill also makes changes to: (1) FEMA's mitigation assistance programs, (2) the usage and collection of specified surcharges and fees, (3) the scope of coverage available under NFIP, (4) requirements of NFIP engineers and adjusters, and (5) regulations relating to the disclosure of flood risks on rental property. This bill amends the Biggert-Waters Flood Insurance Reform Act of 2012 to reauthorize through FY2023 the National Flood Mapping Program.
Title
Sustainable, Affordable, Fair, and Efficient (SAFE) National Flood Insurance Program Reauthorization Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1368 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2090 (Related) 2017-11-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3628 (Related) 2018-12-31 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 148, enrollment corrections on S. 3628 have been made.
SB3670 (Related) 2018-11-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3703 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2090 (Related) 2017-11-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3628 (Related) 2018-12-31 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 148, enrollment corrections on S. 3628 have been made.
SB3670 (Related) 2018-11-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3703 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency planning and evacuation
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Finance and financial sector
Floods and storm protection
Geography
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Insurance industry and regulation
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Intergovernmental relations
Judicial review and appeals
Land use and conservation
Legal fees and court costs
Public contracts and procurement
Real estate business
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Small towns
State and local government operations
Urban and suburban affairs and development
User charges and fees
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency planning and evacuation
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Finance and financial sector
Floods and storm protection
Geography
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Insurance industry and regulation
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Intergovernmental relations
Judicial review and appeals
Land use and conservation
Legal fees and court costs
Public contracts and procurement
Real estate business
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Small towns
State and local government operations
Urban and suburban affairs and development
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3285/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3285/BILLS-115hr3285ih.pdf |