US SB3148 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds five fentanyl analogues and the entire category of fentanyl-related substances to schedule I of the Controlled Substances Act. A schedule I controlled substance is a drug, substance, or chemical that has a high potential for abuse; has no currently accepted medical value; and is subject to regulatory controls and administrative, civil, and criminal penalties under the Controlled Substances Act.
Title
Stopping Overdoses of Fentanyl Analogues Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-03 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (text: CR S7212) |
Same As/Similar To
HB5421 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB2935 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1622 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2701 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5771 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3342 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2935 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1622 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2701 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5771 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3342 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3148/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3148/BILLS-116s3148pcs.pdf |