US HB5771 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the entire category of fentanyl-related substances to schedule I of the Controlled Substances Act. A schedule I controlled substance is a drug, substance, or chemical that has a high potential for abuse; has no currently accepted medical value; and is subject to regulatory controls and administrative, civil, and criminal penalties under the Controlled Substances Act.
Title
Federal Initiative to Guarantee Health by Targeting Fentanyl Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3193 (Related) 2020-01-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 405.
HB2935 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB5421 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1622 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2701 (Same As) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3148 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
SB3342 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2935 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB5421 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1622 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2701 (Same As) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3148 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
SB3342 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5771/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5771/BILLS-116hr5771ih.pdf |