US HB5421 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Controlled Substances Act to list fentanyl-related substances as schedule I controlled substances.
Title
SIFT Act of 2019 Stopping Illicit Trafficking Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] |
Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] |
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. James Comer [R-KY] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] |
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. James Baird [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-12-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2935 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1622 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2701 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3148 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
HB5771 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1622 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2701 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3148 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
HB5771 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Crime and law enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government studies and investigations
Research administration and funding
Administrative remedies
Crime and law enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government studies and investigations
Research administration and funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5421/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5421/BILLS-116hr5421ih.pdf |