US SB2974 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-271.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-271.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to ensure funding for the National Human Trafficking Hotline, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill amends the Victims of Trafficking and Violence Protection Act of 2000 to eliminate the provision that specifies that Department of Health and Human Services national human trafficking hotline grants be funded by amounts made available to the Department of Justice for trafficking victim services grants.
Title
A bill to ensure funding for the National Human Trafficking Hotline, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-14 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-271. |
2016-12-14 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-12-12 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-08 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7412) |
2016-12-08 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7412) |
2016-12-08 | House | Mr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2016-11-29 | House | Held at the desk. |
2016-11-29 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-11-28 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6518-6519) |
2016-11-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6518-6519) |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Department of Justice
Executive agency funding and structure
Health programs administration and funding
Human trafficking
Law enforcement administration and funding
Crime victims
Department of Justice
Executive agency funding and structure
Health programs administration and funding
Human trafficking
Law enforcement administration and funding